Senate | 03/07/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Olsen (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Referred to Energy | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Withdrawn from General Government committee | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Standridge | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading |