Senate | 03/02/2022 | Emergency removed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Burns | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Coauthored by Senator David | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Jech | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading |