Senate | 05/04/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/04/2022 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 5 | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Rosino |