Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1467 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 24, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022