Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|