Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1511 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 28, 2022

Amended

Bill March 8, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022