House | 04/07/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Murdock | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Remove as author Senator Murdock; authored by Senator Standridge | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Murdock |