Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1526 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill February 25, 2022