House | 04/13/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Matthews | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Weaver |