Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/11/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Thompson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Treat
|
|
|