Senate | 04/27/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | General Order | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Coauthored by Lepak | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Kendrix (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Howard |