Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Amendment restores bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Stinson (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|