Senate | 03/21/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Dahm | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Withdrawn from General Government committee | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Dahm | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading |