House | 04/14/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Withdrawn from Joint Committee on Administrative Rules committee | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Administrative Rules | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Dugger |