House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 12 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Dugger | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Rader |