Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1667 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2022