Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
SCs named Pugh, Pemberton, Stanley, Taylor, Newhouse, Dossett (J.A.), Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Provenzano
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Nollan (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Withdrawn from Education committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Pugh
|
|
|