Senate | 04/29/2022 | Approved by Governor 04/29/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Thompson |