Senate | 05/04/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/04/2022 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 16 | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 16 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Leewright |