Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB17 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2020

Engrossed

Bill February 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 4, 2021