Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/25/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
SCs named Paxton, Leewright, Taylor, Rosino, Garvin, Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Dick) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|