House | 04/05/2022 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Treat | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Remove as author Senator Treat; authored by Senator Howard | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Treat |