House | 04/14/2022 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Garvin |