Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Withdrawn from Administrative Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Withdrawn from Joint Committee on Administrative Rules committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Administrative Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Pugh
|
|
|