Senate | 04/29/2022 | Approved by Governor 04/29/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 20; Ayes: 68 Nays: 18 | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Leewright |