SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1773 SFLR Page 1 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 SENATE FLOOR VERSION March 3, 2022 SENATE BILL NO. 1773 By: Howard of the Senate and Kannady of the House [ Governmental Tort Clai ms Act - limits of liability - effective date ] BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 51 O.S. 2021, Section 154, is amended to read as follows: Section 154. A. The total liability of the state and its political subdivisions on claims within t he scope of The Governmental Tort Claim s Act, arising out of an accident or occurrence happening after October 1, 1985, Section 151 et seq . of this title, shall not exceed: 1. Twenty-five Thousand Dollars ($25,000.00) Forty Thousand Dollars ($40,000.00) for any claim or to any claimant who has more than one claim for loss of property arising out of a single act, accident, or occurrence; 2. Except as otherwise provided in this paragra ph, One Hundred Twenty-five Thousand Dollars ($125,000.00) Two Hundred Thousand SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1773 SFLR Page 2 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 Dollars ($200,000.00) to any claimant for a claim for any other loss arising out of a single act, accident, or occurrence. The lim it of liability for the state or any city or county with a population of three hundred thousand (300,000) or more according to the latest Federal Decennial Census, or a political subdivision as def ined in subparagraph s of paragraph 11 of Section 152 of th is title, shall not exceed One Hundred Seventy-five Thousand Dollars ($175,000.00) Two Hundred Seventy-five Thousand Dollars ($275,000.00) . Except, however, the limits of the liability for the University Hospitals and State Mental Health Hospitals opera ted by the Department of Mental Health and Subst ance Abuse Services for claims arising from medical negligence shall be Two Hundred Thousand Dollars ($200,000.00) Three Hundred Thousand Dollars ($300,000.00). For claims arising from medical negligence by any licensed physician, osteopathic physician or certified nurse-midwife rendering prenatal, delivery or infant care services from September 1, 1991, through June 30, 1996, pursuant to a contract authorized by subsection B of Section 1-106 of Title 63 of the Oklahoma Statutes and in conformity with the requirements of Section 1 -233 of Title 63 of the Oklahoma Statutes, the limits of the liability shall be Two Hundred Thousand Dollars ($200,000.00) Three Hundred Thousand Dollars ($300,000.00) ; or SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1773 SFLR Page 3 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 3. One Million Dollars ($1,000,000.00) One Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ($1,500,000.00) for any number of claims arising out of a single occurrence o r accident. B. 1. Beginning on May 28, 2003, claims shall be allowed for wrongful criminal felony conviction resulting in imprisonment if the claimant has received a full pardon on the basis of a written finding by the Governor of actual innocence for th e crime for which the claimant was sentenced or has been granted judicial relief absolving the claimant of guil t on the basis of actual innocence of the crime for which the claimant was sentenced. The Governor or the court shall specifically state, in the pardon or order, the evidence or basis on which the finding of actual innocence is based. 2. As used in parag raph 1 of this subsection, for a claimant to recover based on “actual innocence”, the individual must meet the following criteria: a. the individual was charged, by indictment or information, with the commission of a public offense classified as a felony, b. the individual did not plead guilty to the offense charged, or to any lesser included offense, but was convicted of the offense, c. the individual was sentenced to incarceration for a term of imprisonment as a result of the conviction, SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1773 SFLR Page 4 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 d. the individual was imprisoned solely on the basis of the conviction for the offense, and e. (1) in the case of a pardon, a determination was made by either the Pardon and Parole Board or the Governor that the offense for which the individual was convicted, sentenced and imprisoned, including any lesser offenses, w as not committed by the individual, or (2) in the case of judicial relief, a court of competent jurisdiction found by clear and convincing evidence that the offense for which the individual was convicted, senten ced and imprisoned, including any lesser incl uded offenses, was not committed by the individual and issued an order vacating, dismissing or rever sing the conviction and sentence and providing that no further proceedings can be or will be held against the individual on any facts and circumstances alleged in the proceedings which had resulted in the conviction. 3. A claimant shall not be entitled to compensation for any part of a sentence in prison during which the claimant was also serving a concurrent sent ence for a crime not covered by this subsection. SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1773 SFLR Page 5 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 4. The total liability of the state and its political subdivisions on any claim within the scop e of The Governmental Tort Claims Act arising out of wrongful criminal felony conviction resulting in imprisonm ent shall not exceed One Hundred Seventy-five Thousand Dollars ($175,000.00) Two Hundred Seventy-five Thousand Dollars ($275,000.00) . 5. The provisions of this subsection shall apply to convictions occurring on or before May 28, 2003, as well as convictio ns occurring after May 28, 2003. If a court of competent jurisdiction finds that retroactive application of this subsection is unconstitutional, the prospe ctive application of this subsection shall remain valid. C. No award for damages in an action or an y claim against the state or a political subd ivision shall include punitive or exemplary damages. D. When the amount awarded to or settled upon multiple claimants exceeds the limitations of this secti on, any party may apply to the district court which has jurisdiction of the cause to apportion to each claimant the claimant ’s proper share of the total amount as limited herein. The share apportioned to each c laimant shall be in the proportion that the r atio of the award or settlement made to him each claimant bears to the aggregate awards and settlements for all claims against the state or its political subdivisions arising out of the occurrence. When the amo unt of the SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1773 SFLR Page 6 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 aggregate losses presented by a single claimant exceeds the limits of paragraph 1 or 2 of subsection A of this section, each person suffering a loss shall be entitled to that person ’s proportionate share. E. The total liability of resident phys icians and interns while participating in a graduate medica l education program of the University of Oklahoma College of Medicine, its affiliated institutions and the Oklahoma State University College of Osteopathic Medicine and Surgery shall not exceed One Hundred Thousand Dollars ($100,000.00) One Hundred Fifty Thousand Dollars ($150,000.00). F. The state or a political subdiv ision may petition t he court that all parties and actions arising out of a single accident or occurrence shall be joined as provide d by law, and upon order of the court the proceedings upon good cause shown shall be continued for a reasonable time or until such joinder has been completed. The state or political subdivision shall be allowed to interplead in any action which may impose on it any duty or liability pursuant to The Governmental Tort Claims Act. G. The liability of the state or political subdiv ision under The Governmental Tort Claims Act shall be several from that of any other person or entity, and the state or political s ubdivision shall only be liable for that percentage of total damages that corresponds to its percentage of total negligence. Nothing in this section SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1773 SFLR Page 7 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 shall be construed as increasing the liability limits imposed on the state or political subdivision under The Governmental Tort Claims Act. SECTION 2. This act shall become effective Novemb er 1, 2022. COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS March 3, 2022 - DO PASS. Title stricken by Committee on Judicia ry.