House
|
04/11/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore, Culver, Strom, Newton, Rosecrants, Burns, West (Josh), Kendrix, Sneed, Blancett, Munson, McBride
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Kidd
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Mize
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Luttrell
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Patzkowsky
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Dobrinski
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Rader
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Quinn
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator David
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Jech
|
|
|