Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1781 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022