House | 04/06/2022 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Talley (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Kirt | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Rader |