Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1800 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 10, 2022

Amended

Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 3, 2022