Senate | 05/05/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/05/2022 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Direct to Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Withdrawn from Judiciary committee | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Howard |