Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1825 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/20/2022

                     
 
 
Req. No. 3389 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022) 
 
SENATE BILL 1825 	By: Merrick 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to courts; amending 20 O.S. 2021, 
Section 122, which relates to speci al judges; 
limiting duration of certain appointmen ts; 
authorizing appointment in different judicial 
district; and providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY    20 O.S. 2021, Section 122, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 122. The number of special judges that may be appointed 
in each judicial administrative district shall be determined as 
follows: 
1.  A special judge shall b e appointed on the basis of one 
special judge for each county within the administ rative district 
with a population of at least twenty -four thousand (24,000), as 
determined by the 1960 Federal Decennial Census.  An additional 
special judge shall be appointe d for each additional fifty tho usand 
(50,000) in population in a county within th e administrative 
district, as determined by the 1960 Federal Dece nnial Census.  Such   
 
 
Req. No. 3389 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
appointment may be made from any county in the administrative 
district.  Such appointments shall be made by the district judges in 
their respective judicial administrative districts.  Any judge of a 
special sessions court shall be one o f the special judges for the 
balance of his term and shall be within the number prescribed for 
said district. 
2.  In addition to the special judges that may be appointed 
pursuant to the provi sions of paragraph 1 of this section, there 
shall be: 
a. one (1) special judge appointed in the Northwest -
Panhandle Judicial Administrative District comprised 
of District Court Judicial Districts Numbers On e (1), 
Two (2) and Four (4), to serve in Custer Co unty;, 
b. one (1) special judge appointed in the Oklahoma -
Canadian Counties Judicial Administrative District 
comprised of District Court Judicial District Number 
Seven (7);, 
c. three (3) special judges appointed in the Tulsa-Pawnee 
Counties Judicial Admini strative District comprised of 
District Court Judicial District Num ber Fourteen 
(14);, 
d. beginning January 11, 1999, one (1) special judge 
appointed in the Northeastern Judicial Administrative 
District comprised of District Court Judicial   
 
 
Req. No. 3389 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Districts Numbers Ten (10), Eleven (11), Twelve (12) 
and Thirteen (13), to serve in Rogers County;, 
e. one (1) special judge appointed in the North Central 
Judicial Administrative District compri sed of District 
Court Judicial District Numbers Eight (8), Nine (9) 
and Twenty-three (23), to serve in Lincoln and 
Pottawatomie Counties ;, 
f. beginning January 1, 2006, one (1) special judge 
appointed in the East Central Judicial Administrative 
District comprised of District Court J udicial District 
Numbers Fifteen (15), Eighteen (1 8) and Twenty-four 
(24), to serve in Pittsburg and McIntosh Counties ;, 
g. beginning January 1, 2006, one (1) special judge 
appointed in the Northeastern Judicial Administrative 
District comprised of Distric t Court Judicial District 
Numbers Ten (10), Eleven (11), Twelve (12) and 
Thirteen (13), to serve in Washington County ;, and 
h. beginning January 1, 2007, one (1) special judge 
appointed in the Southeastern Judicial Administrative 
District comprised of Dist rict Court Judicial District 
Numbers Sixteen (16), Seventeen (17), Nineteen (19), 
and Twenty-five (25), to serve in LeFlo re County. 
3.  If a vacancy occurs in the office of associate district 
judge, or if an associate district judg e becomes unable to perfo rm   
 
 
Req. No. 3389 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
the duties of his office, as determined by the presiding judge of 
the judicial administrative district, a special judg e may be 
appointed within the judicial administrative district to hold office 
for the duration of said vacancy or incapacity.  After th e vacancy 
is filled, or after the associate distri ct judge becomes able to 
perform the duties of his office, the special judge shall have the 
power to act in regard to any case which he has already tried, but 
the presiding judge of the judicial administrat ive district may 
transfer such a case to any other judge in the judicial 
administrative district. 
4.  The Chief Justice o f the Supreme Court may authorize the 
appointment of such additional special judges as may be necessary 
for the proper administration o f justice.  Such additional special 
judges shall be appointed after application by a majority of the 
district judges of a judicial administrative district, stating the 
reason why an additional special judge is needed.  Such additio nal 
judges need not be ba sed upon population figures. 
5.  An appointment of a special judge may not exceed two (2) 
years.  After a two-year appointment, a special judge may be 
reappointed by another district judge or in another judicial 
district. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective Novembe r 1, 2022. 
 
58-2-3389 TEK 1/20/2022 8:14:09 PM