Senate | 04/28/2022 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | Title restored | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Paxton |