Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1858 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2022
Bill March 15, 2022

Amended

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2022