Senate | 02/17/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Coauthored by Senator David | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Remove as author Senator David; authored by Senator Leewright | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator David | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading |