Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Returned by Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Recalled by: SCR26
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 21
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Sims, Randleman
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Grego
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Pae
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Leewright
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Jech
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Kidd
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Simpson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Rader
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Olsen
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator McCortney
|
|
|