Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB198 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 29, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 22, 2021