Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB208 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 30, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 14, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021