House | 04/20/2021 | Remove Senator Burns as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Howard | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 10 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Dempsey (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Burns |