Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB22 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021