Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB228 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 13, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2021