Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB236 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2021

Amended

Bill April 15, 2021
Bill February 25, 2021