House | 03/31/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin (David) | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 14 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 16 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Pemberton |