House | 03/30/2021 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Grego (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Allen |