Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB263 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 7, 2021

Amended

Bill March 25, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021