Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB267 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2021

Amended

Bill April 5, 2021
Bill February 21, 2021