Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB27 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2021