Senate | 05/12/2021 | Approved by Governor 05/12/2021 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 19 | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Quinn |