Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate, West (Kevin)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Waldron
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|