House | 03/30/2021 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (David) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |